This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/03/2022 at 01:45:31 (UTC).

RICHARD JAMES JIANNUZZI VS JANET LEE JIANNUZZI

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 RICHARD JAMES JIANNUZZI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JANET LEE JIANNUZZI. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILENSKY, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILENSKY, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RICHARD JAMES JIANNUZZI

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Respondents

JANET LEE JIANNUZZI

Jacksonville, FL 32211

JANET JIANNUZZI

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

White, Christopher Adams

1837 Hendricks Ave

Jacksonville, FL 32207-3303

Respondent Attorney

Williams, Jennifer Boston

3829 Atlantic Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32207-2032

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Leitman, Steven Alan

Po Box 51363

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32240-1363

 

Court Documents

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

2/9/2022- D6- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CHRISTOPHER WHITE FOR RICHARD JIANNUZZI

2/9/2022- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CHRISTOPHER WHITE FOR RICHARD JIANNUZZI

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/RICHARD JIANNUZZI ATTY

2/9/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/RICHARD JIANNUZZI ATTY

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -RICHARD JIANNUZZI

2/9/2022- D10- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -RICHARD JIANNUZZI

NOTICE (HUSBAND'S) OF PROPOUNDING STANDARD FAMILY LAW IMTERROGATORIES

2/9/2022- D8- NOTICE (HUSBAND'S) OF PROPOUNDING STANDARD FAMILY LAW IMTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED -JANET JIANNUZZI

2/9/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED -JANET JIANNUZZI

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JENNIFER WILLIAMS FOR JANET JIANNUZZI

3/4/2022- D13- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JENNIFER WILLIAMS FOR JANET JIANNUZZI

CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4102836

3/7/2022- D17- CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4102836

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS JANET LEE JIANNUZZI SERVED 02/16/2022 12:11 PM

2/24/2022- D12- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS JANET LEE JIANNUZZI SERVED 02/16/2022 12:11 PM

ANSWER (WIFE'S) TO HUSBAND'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND WIFE'S COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

3/7/2022- D16- ANSWER (WIFE'S) TO HUSBAND'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND WIFE'S COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

PITIONER/HUSBAND'S ANSWER TO RESPONDENT/WIFE'S COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE / RICHARD JAMES JIANNUZZI/ATTY

3/8/2022- D19- PITIONER/HUSBAND'S ANSWER TO RESPONDENT/WIFE'S COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE / RICHARD JAMES JIANNUZZI/ATTY

HUSBAND'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY / RICHARD JAMES JIANNUZZI/ATTY

3/8/2022- D20- HUSBAND'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY / RICHARD JAMES JIANNUZZI/ATTY

AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY (COUNT I - PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE)

3/21/2022- D22- AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY (COUNT I - PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE)

ANSWER OF WIFE TO HUSBAND'S AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY / JANET LEE JIANNUZZI / ATTY.

3/23/2022- D23- ANSWER OF WIFE TO HUSBAND'S AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY / JANET LEE JIANNUZZI / ATTY.

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /JANET L. JIANNUZZI

4/13/2022- D26- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /JANET L. JIANNUZZI

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/29/2022; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE /AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/24/2022; NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/13/2022 @ 09:00 AM ROOM 745

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/10/2022; NOTICE (OF PRODUCTION) PETITIONER/HUSBAND'S THIRD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2022; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (HUSBAND'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/25/2022; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-PETITIONER/HUSBAND'S SECOND-RICHARD JAMES JIANNUZZI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES /RICHARD JAMES JIANNUZZI/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2022; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES/RICHARD JAMES JIANNUZZI/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2022; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SUBSTITUTE SERVED MARIA REYES, DOC IMAGE TECH (FOR RECORDS/LEGAL) ON 4/28/2022 @3:35PM/ VYSTAR TOWER 76 S. LAURA STREET, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2022; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA /SUBSTITUTE SERVED SHANA ABULY, VP MEMBER EXPERIENCE (FOR RECORDS/LEGAL) ON 4/28/2022 @2:36PM /ALIVE CREDIT UNION @9790 TOUCHTON RD, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32246

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2022; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA /SUBSTITUTE SERVED KIM DIDONNA, FSR FRONT DESK (FOR RECORDS/LEGAL) ON 4/28/2022 @2:35PM/ 121 FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION @9700 TOUCHTON RD., JACKSONVILLE, FL 32246

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -JANET JIANNUZZI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -RICHARD JIANNUZZI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; NOTICE (HUSBAND'S) OF PROPOUNDING STANDARD FAMILY LAW IMTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; DEMAND FOR COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 12.285

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CHRISTOPHER WHITE FOR RICHARD JIANNUZZI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/RICHARD JIANNUZZI ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leitman, Steven Alan