This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/23/2022 at 00:16:17 (UTC).

RICHARD ATWOOD VS GOVERNMENT CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 RICHARD ATWOOD filed an Other lawsuit against GOVERNMENT CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD ATWOOD

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendants

GOVERNMENT CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC.

C/O Incorporating Services 1540 Glenway Dr

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JACOBS ENGINEERING INC.

C/O Ct Corp 1200 S Pine Island Rd

Tallahassee, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

5/6/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/PETITION AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/6/2022- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4147268

5/9/2022- D4- CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4147268

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JACOBS ENGINEERING, INC.

7/8/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO JACOBS ENGINEERING, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOVERNMENT CONTRACTING RESOURCES, INC.

7/8/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOVERNMENT CONTRACTING RESOURCES, INC.

CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4189156

7/8/2022- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4189156

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON JACOBS ENGINEERING INC ON 8/9/22 AT 2:50PM

8/12/2022- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON JACOBS ENGINEERING INC ON 8/9/22 AT 2:50PM

NOTICE OF FILING (DEFT) REMOVAL

9/8/2022- D10- NOTICE OF FILING (DEFT) REMOVAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/8/2022; NOTICE OF FILING (DEFT) REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON JACOBS ENGINEERING INC ON 8/9/22 AT 2:50PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4189156

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOVERNMENT CONTRACTING RESOURCES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JACOBS ENGINEERING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/9/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/9/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4147268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/9/2022; COMPLAINT/PETITION AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/9/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/9/2022; DISCRIMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JACOBS ENGINEERING INC is a litigant