This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/04/2022 at 04:21:26 (UTC).

RAYMOND CHAMBLESS VS KOHLS INC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 RAYMOND CHAMBLESS filed an Other lawsuit against KOHLS INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEARING, KATIE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAYMOND CHAMBLESS

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Defendants

KOHLS INC

801 Us Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

DIVERSIFIED MAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC

DIVERSIFIED MAINTENANCE SYSTEMS LLC

17888 67Th Court North

Loxahatchee, FL 33470

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roach, Matthew Todd

4735 Sunbeam Rd

Jacksonville, FL 32257-6107

Defendant Attorneys

Springer, Todd Tellson

301 W Bay St Ste 1050

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5139

Costa, Caitlin Elizabeth

5422 Bay Center Dr Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33609-3420

Gagain, Edward Francis III

1135 Marbella Plaza Dr

Tampa, FL 33619-7905

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEF, KOHL'S, INC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO PLTF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/22/2022- D27- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEF, KOHL'S, INC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO PLTF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED DIVERSIFIED MAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC

7/19/2022- D25- SUMMONS ISSUED DIVERSIFIED MAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC

AMENDED COMPLAINT - FIRST

7/18/2022- D24- AMENDED COMPLAINT - FIRST

ORDER GRANTING MOTION (PLAINTIFFS) FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/18/2022- D23- ORDER GRANTING MOTION (PLAINTIFFS) FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF)

7/14/2022- D22- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF)

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF)

7/14/2022- D21- NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S)

5/31/2022- D20- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S)

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT (PLTF.)

5/24/2022- D19- MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT (PLTF.)

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS (PLANTIFF'S AMENDED)

4/25/2022- D18- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS (PLANTIFF'S AMENDED)

ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL EDWARD GAGAIN III FOR KOHLS INC

3/31/2022- D17- ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL EDWARD GAGAIN III FOR KOHLS INC

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

3/30/2022- D16- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (JOINT)

3/29/2022- D15- STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (JOINT)

REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLTF'S)

3/9/2022- D14- REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLTF'S)

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - DEFT

3/4/2022- D13- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - DEFT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S FIRST) TO PLTF

2/24/2022- D12- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S FIRST) TO PLTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S FIRST) TO PLTF

2/24/2022- D11- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S FIRST) TO PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES -DEFT

2/24/2022- D10- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES -DEFT

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFT'S KOHL'S INC.,) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

2/24/2022- D9- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFT'S KOHL'S INC.,) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEF, KOHL'S, INC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO PLTF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4196796

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED DIVERSIFIED MAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; AMENDED COMPLAINT - FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; ORDER GRANTING MOTION (PLAINTIFFS) FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/18/2022; NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/24/2022; MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT (PLTF.)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2022; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TODD SPRINGER FOR KOHLS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4082226

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO KOHL'S, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diversified Maintenance Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kohls Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAITLIN E COSTA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD FRANCIS GAGAIN III