This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 11/22/2021 at 00:59:51 (UTC).

RAQUELLA ROBINSON VS THOMAS GRADY ROBINSON JR

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 RAQUELLA ROBINSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOMAS GRADY ROBINSON JR. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GUY, JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GUY, JOHN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAQUELLA ROBINSON

Middleburg, FL 32068

Respondent

THOMAS GRADY ROBINSON JR

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kenny, Renae

3168 Us Highway 17 Ste G

Fleming Island, FL 32003-7129

Respondent Attorney

Cobbin, Kevin Michael

525 N Newnan St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3121

 

Court Documents

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

4/15/2021- D10- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RENAE KENNY FOR RAQUELLA ROBINSON

4/15/2021- D3- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RENAE KENNY FOR RAQUELLA ROBINSON

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862104

4/15/2021- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862104

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/ RAQUELLA JANAE ROBINSON/ ATTY

4/15/2021- D7- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/ RAQUELLA JANAE ROBINSON/ ATTY

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -LINKED

4/15/2021- D5- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -LINKED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER / RENAE KENNY ESQ.

4/15/2021- D9- MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER / RENAE KENNY ESQ.

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

4/15/2021- D4- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT / RAQUELLA JANAE ROBINSON

4/15/2021- D6- UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT / RAQUELLA JANAE ROBINSON

SUMMONS ISSUED THOMAS ROBINSON

4/15/2021- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED THOMAS ROBINSON

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KEVIN COBBIN FOR THOMAS ROBINSON JR AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

4/19/2021- D13- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL KEVIN COBBIN FOR THOMAS ROBINSON JR AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER TO PETITION , FILED BY KEVIN COBBIN, ATTORNEY FOR THOMAS ROBINSON

4/30/2021- D15- ANSWER TO PETITION , FILED BY KEVIN COBBIN, ATTORNEY FOR THOMAS ROBINSON

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

6/10/2021- D21- CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE EXHIBIT A/RAQUELLA JANAE ROBINSON/ATTY

6/10/2021- D22- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE EXHIBIT A/RAQUELLA JANAE ROBINSON/ATTY

ORDER MEDIATION

7/26/2021- D24- ORDER MEDIATION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -10/29/2021 @ 9:30 A.M. VIA ZOOM

7/28/2021- D25- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -10/29/2021 @ 9:30 A.M. VIA ZOOM

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -THOMAS G. ROBINSON JR.

6/4/2021- D20- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -THOMAS G. ROBINSON JR.

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -RENAE KENNY

10/8/2021- D26- NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -RENAE KENNY

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/1/2021; MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT (AGREEMENT REACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/11/2021; NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -RENAE KENNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/30/2021; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -10/29/2021 @ 9:30 A.M. VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2021; ORDER MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE /THOMAS ROBINSON/ATTY TO WIFE'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE EXHIBIT A/RAQUELLA JANAE ROBINSON/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2021; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2021; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -THOMAS G. ROBINSON JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2021; CFID-CERTIFICATE THOMAS C. ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED THOMAS ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT / RAQUELLA JANAE ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER / RENAE KENNY ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RENAE KENNY FOR RAQUELLA ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -LINKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/ RAQUELLA JANAE ROBINSON/ ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cobbin, Kevin Michael