Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/13/2021 at 15:13:54 (UTC).

QUICKEN LOANS LLC VS Brenda Olivia (Deceased) Moore Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 QUICKEN LOANS LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Brenda Olivia Deceased Moore. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUICKEN LOANS LLC

2424 North Federal Highway Suite 360

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL LEE MOORE

Saint Augustine, FL 32084

ROBERT SMITH

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Brenda Olivia (Deceased) Moore

MICHAEL LEE MOORE

Saint Augustine, FL 32084

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1

Jacksonville, FL 32216

TARA MICHELLE SMITH

Jacksonville, FL 32218

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Weaver, Zachary Lee

Attorney at Gallivan, White & Boyd, P.A.

55 Beattie Pl Ste 1200

Greenville, SC 29601-2170

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - SUBSTITUTE SERVED UPON: ROBERT SMITH BY SERVING ( MICHELLE SMITH/SPOUSE ) -ON- 04/28/2021 @ 01:30 P.M.

5/10/2021- D25- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - SUBSTITUTE SERVED UPON: ROBERT SMITH BY SERVING ( MICHELLE SMITH/SPOUSE ) -ON- 04/28/2021 @ 01:30 P.M.

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - SUBSTITUTE SERVED UPON: MICHAEL LEE MOORE BY SERVING ( ELISSA CROWLEY/CO-RESIDENT ) -ON- 04/27/2021 @ 02:25 P.M.

5/10/2021- D24- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - SUBSTITUTE SERVED UPON: MICHAEL LEE MOORE BY SERVING ( ELISSA CROWLEY/CO-RESIDENT ) -ON- 04/27/2021 @ 02:25 P.M.

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON: TARA MICHELLE SMOTH - ON- 04/28/2021 @ 01:30 P.M.

5/10/2021- D23- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON: TARA MICHELLE SMOTH - ON- 04/28/2021 @ 01:30 P.M.

NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED -AGAINST UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, CREDITORS, LIENORS, AND TRUSTEES OF BRENDA OLIVIA MOORE A/K/A BRENDA O. MOORE A/K/A BRENDA BUTLER MOORE, DECEASED

5/7/2021- D22- NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED -AGAINST UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, CREDITORS, LIENORS, AND TRUSTEES OF BRENDA OLIVIA MOORE A/K/A BRENDA O. MOORE A/K/A BRENDA BUTLER MOORE, DECEASED

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3883212

5/5/2021- D21- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3883212

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY -AGAINST UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, CREDITORS, LIENORS, AND TRUSTEES OF BRENDA OLIVIA MOORE A/K/A BRENDA O. MOORE A/K/A BRENDA BUTLER MOORE, DECEASED

5/5/2021- D18- AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY -AGAINST UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, CREDITORS, LIENORS, AND TRUSTEES OF BRENDA OLIVIA MOORE A/K/A BRENDA O. MOORE A/K/A BRENDA BUTLER MOORE, DECEASED

CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 06/15/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

4/16/2021- D15- CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 06/15/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,111.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861951

4/15/2021- D13- CASE FEES PAID: $1,111.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861951

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

4/15/2021- D5- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

4/15/2021- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Managment Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UPON: UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2 -ON- 04/26/2021 @ 06:15 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UPON: UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #1 -ON- 04/26/2021 @ 06:15 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UPON: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL LEE MOORE -ON- 04/27/2021 @ 02:25 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - SUBSTITUTE SERVED UPON: ROBERT SMITH BY SERVING ( MICHELLE SMITH/SPOUSE ) -ON- 04/28/2021 @ 01:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - SUBSTITUTE SERVED UPON: MICHAEL LEE MOORE BY SERVING ( ELISSA CROWLEY/CO-RESIDENT ) -ON- 04/27/2021 @ 02:25 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON: TARA MICHELLE SMOTH - ON- 04/28/2021 @ 01:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : NOTICE OF ACTION ($10/ea); Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/7/2021; NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED -AGAINST UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, CREDITORS, LIENORS, AND TRUSTEES OF BRENDA OLIVIA MOORE A/K/A BRENDA O. MOORE A/K/A BRENDA BUTLER MOORE, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/7/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3883212

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL LEE MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED ; ROBERT SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED ; MICHAEL LEE MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED ; TARA MICHELLE SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19685 PAGE 1656-1657

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NON-HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE $50,001 - $249,999

    Read MoreRead Less