This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 11/27/2022 at 21:19:16 (UTC).

Q DUVAL HOLDINGS LLC VS MONIQUE MCMILLIAN

Case Summary

On 09/25/2022 Q DUVAL HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MONIQUE MCMILLIAN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KALIL, MICHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KALIL, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Q DUVAL HOLDINGS LLC

Po Box 4300

Scottsdale, AZ 85261

Defendant

MONIQUE MCMILLIAN

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cruikshank, Elizabeth Marie

6065 Roswell Rd Ste 680

Atlanta, GA 30328-4011

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4245742

9/23/2022- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4245742

COVER SHEET

9/25/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TO MONIQUE MCMILLIAN

9/25/2022- D3- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TO MONIQUE MCMILLIAN

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

9/25/2022- D4- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONIQUE MCMILLIAN

9/25/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONIQUE MCMILLIAN

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT)

10/11/2022- D7- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/13/22 @ 1:46PM TO MONIQUE MCMILLIAN, POSTED - PLAINTIFF

10/14/2022- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/13/22 @ 1:46PM TO MONIQUE MCMILLIAN, POSTED - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/17/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/13/22 @ 1:46PM TO MONIQUE MCMILLIAN, POSTED - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2022; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONIQUE MCMILLIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TO MONIQUE MCMILLIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4245742

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Q DUVAL HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK