This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/27/2022 at 08:29:10 (UTC).

PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC, A MICHIGAN LIMITED LIABILILTY COMPANY F/K/A PULTE HOME CORPORATION, A MICHIGAN CORPORATION VS ALLIANCE BUILDING SOLUTIONS, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC, A MICHIGAN LIMITED LIABILILTY COMPANY F/K/A PULTE HOME CORPORATION, A MICHIGAN CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALLIANCE BUILDING SOLUTIONS, INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEARING, KATIE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC, A MICHIGAN LIMITED LIABILILTY COMPANY F/K/A PULTE HOME CORPORATION, A MICHIGAN CORPORATION

2050 Mcgregor Blvd.

Fort Myers, FL 33901

Defendants

BAYBERRY AT BARTRAM PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

C/O Sentry Management Inc, 2180 West Sr 434 Ste 5000

Longwood, FL 32779

ALLIANCE BUILDING SOLUTIONS, INC.

6593 Powers Avenue, #9

Jacksonville, FL 32217

RF GROUP, LLC., D/B/A MCGOWAN'S HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC. N/K/A MCGOWAN'S INVESTMENTS, INC.

14 East Bay Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

PRFECT SOLUTIONS CONTRACTING CORPORATION

399 Aspinwall Parkway

St. Augustine, FL 32095

TRIM BY DESIGN, INC.

3841 Michaels Landing Circle East

Jacksonville, FL 32224

VISIONAIRE OF JAX, INC., D/B/A VISIONAIRE WINDOWS

2910 W Beaver St

Jacksonville, FL 32254

AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

CLEAR BLUE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

MAPFRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

NATIONAL BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

OLD DOMINION INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

BERKLEY ASSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

THE BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

AMERISURE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anderson, Amanda Kaye

9111 W College Pointe Dr

Fort Myers, FL 33919-3379

Defendant Attorneys

Cordova, Andres Roman

1221 Brickell Ave Ste 1600

Miami, FL 33131-3247

Bahadoran, Sina

1221 Brickell Ave Ste 1600

Miami, FL 33131-3247

Curtis, Lauren S

55 1St St S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701-3995

Blumenthal, Dustin Craig

Po Box 787

Buffalo, NY 14201-0787

Grant, Siobhan Earlyn Pennington

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 4

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6044

Grimm, Reed W

50 N Laura St Ste 3500

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3663

Gargano, Heather

231 E Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3305

Stein Fulton, Wendy Jill

110 E Broward Blvd Ste 610

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-3560

Other Attorneys

Haine-Roberts, Logan Galbraith

800 3Rd Ave Fl 13

New York, NY 10022-7688

Mendez, Amanda Marie

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4305

Maza, Jorge Alexander

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 4

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6044

Ryan, Fay Elizabeth

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4305

Rosengarten, Yonit

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4305

Covone, Neil Anthony

Attorney at Bice Cole Law Firm P L

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 710

Coral Gables, FL 33134-3042

Hernandez, Pedro E Jr

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 4

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6044

Gould, Nicole Di Pauli

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd Fl 4

Miami, FL 33134-6044

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTFS) TO DEFT LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AND

6/21/2022- D156- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTFS) TO DEFT LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AND

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON RF GROUP LLC D/B/A MCGOWNA HEATING & AIR CONDITIONINC INC N/K/A MCGOWAN'S INVESTMENTS INC C/O WADE S MCGOWANS, AS RA ON 06/16/2022 @200PM BY ROBERT SCHAFFER

6/21/2022- D155- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON RF GROUP LLC D/B/A MCGOWNA HEATING & AIR CONDITIONINC INC N/K/A MCGOWAN'S INVESTMENTS INC C/O WADE S MCGOWANS, AS RA ON 06/16/2022 @200PM BY ROBERT SCHAFFER

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF.)

6/21/2022- D154- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF.)

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTFS) TO DEFT, CINCINNATI SPECIALTY UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AND

6/21/2022- D153- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTFS) TO DEFT, CINCINNATI SPECIALTY UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AND

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S)

6/20/2022- D152- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S)

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (DEFENDANT GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY'S)

6/15/2022- D151- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (DEFENDANT GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY'S)

6/13/2022- D150- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY'S)

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/13/2022- D149- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LAUREN CURTIS FOR COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

6/13/2022- D148- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LAUREN CURTIS FOR COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT SOUTHERN OWNERS') TO PULTE'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/10/2022- D147- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT SOUTHERN OWNERS') TO PULTE'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON SOUTHEAST WALL SYSTEMS LLC BY SERVING RONALD M BHAME AS RA ON 06/06/2022 @542PM

6/9/2022- D146- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON SOUTHEAST WALL SYSTEMS LLC BY SERVING RONALD M BHAME AS RA ON 06/06/2022 @542PM

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANYS)

6/8/2022- D143- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANYS)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL PEDRO HERNANDEZ JR. FOR ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

6/8/2022- D141- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL PEDRO HERNANDEZ JR. FOR ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CROWN ROOFING LLC ON 6/2/22 @ 310PM

6/7/2022- D145- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CROWN ROOFING LLC ON 6/2/22 @ 310PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON VALLENCOURT CONSTRUCTION CO. ON 6/2/22 @ 220PM

6/7/2022- D144- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON VALLENCOURT CONSTRUCTION CO. ON 6/2/22 @ 220PM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICOLE GOULD FOR MID-CONTINENT CASUALTY COMPANY

6/7/2022- D142- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICOLE GOULD FOR MID-CONTINENT CASUALTY COMPANY

STIPULATION (JOINT) TO AMEND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY INTERLINEATION TO CORRECT CARRIER REFERENCE

6/7/2022- D140- STIPULATION (JOINT) TO AMEND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY INTERLINEATION TO CORRECT CARRIER REFERENCE

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT BY LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

6/7/2022- D139- ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT BY LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

142 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTFS) TO DEFT LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON RF GROUP LLC D/B/A MCGOWNA HEATING & AIR CONDITIONINC INC N/K/A MCGOWAN'S INVESTMENTS INC C/O WADE S MCGOWANS, AS RA ON 06/16/2022 @200PM BY ROBERT SCHAFFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTFS) TO DEFT, CINCINNATI SPECIALTY UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/21/2022; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (DEFENDANT GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LAUREN CURTIS FOR COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT SOUTHERN OWNERS') TO PULTE'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/ADDL DEFENDANT FEE @$2.50ea; Assessed : $27.50; Paid : $27.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $458.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4103466

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO OLD DOMINION INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO MAPFRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO FCCI INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2022; INSURANCE CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RF GROUP, LLC DBA MCGOWANS HEATING AIR CONDIT is a litigant