This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 11/20/2022 at 21:03:48 (UTC).

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 12 LLC VS COSWALD BRYCE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2022 PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 12 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COSWALD BRYCE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 12 LLC

Po Box 4300

Scottsdale, AZ 85261

Defendants

DIAMOND BRYCE

Jacksonville, FL 32244

COSWALD BRYCE

Jacksonville, FL 32244

GILLIOUN BURTON

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cruikshank, Elizabeth Marie

6065 Roswell Rd Ste 680

Atlanta, GA 30328-4011

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET -FILED BY PLAINTIFF

9/18/2022- D2- COVER SHEET -FILED BY PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION -FILED BY PLAINTIFF

9/18/2022- D6- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION -FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED DIAMOND BRYCE

9/18/2022- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED DIAMOND BRYCE

SUMMONS ISSUED COSWALD BRYCE

9/18/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED COSWALD BRYCE

SUMMONS ISSUED GILLIOUN BURTON

9/18/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED GILLIOUN BURTON

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DIAMOND BRYCE

9/18/2022- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DIAMOND BRYCE

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS COSWALD BRYCE

9/18/2022- D8- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS COSWALD BRYCE

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS GILLIOUN BURTON

9/18/2022- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS GILLIOUN BURTON

CASE FEES PAID: $225.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4239364

9/19/2022- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $225.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4239364

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

10/5/2022- D11- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/05/2022 01:45PM SUBSTITUTE, DIAMOND BRYCE FR GILLOUN BURTON

10/7/2022- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/05/2022 01:45PM SUBSTITUTE, DIAMOND BRYCE FR GILLOUN BURTON

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/05/2022 01:45PM PERSONAL, DIAMOND BRYCE

10/7/2022- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/05/2022 01:45PM PERSONAL, DIAMOND BRYCE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/05/2022 01:45PM SUBSTITUTE, DIAMOND BRYCE FPR COSWALD BRYCE

10/7/2022- D14- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/05/2022 01:45PM SUBSTITUTE, DIAMOND BRYCE FPR COSWALD BRYCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/05/2022 01:45PM SUBSTITUTE, DIAMOND BRYCE FPR COSWALD BRYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/05/2022 01:45PM PERSONAL, DIAMOND BRYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/05/2022 01:45PM SUBSTITUTE, DIAMOND BRYCE FR GILLOUN BURTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2022; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $225.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4239364

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS GILLIOUN BURTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS COSWALD BRYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DIAMOND BRYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED GILLIOUN BURTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED COSWALD BRYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED DIAMOND BRYCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2022; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION -FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2022; COVER SHEET -FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/19/2022; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK