This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 05/10/2022 at 11:17:16 (UTC).

PRO SEALED ASPHALT, INC. VS JOYCE HUBB Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 PRO SEALED ASPHALT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOYCE HUBB. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SACKS, JONATHAN and KITE, LONDON M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SACKS, JONATHAN

KITE, LONDON M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRO SEALED ASPHALT, INC.

50 N. Laura Street, Suite 2500

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

JOYCE'S TRUCKING, INC.

1010 Jones Road

Jacksonville, FL 32236

JOYCE HUBB

Jacksonville, FL 32236

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen, James D III

50 N Laura St Ste 2500

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3646

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

11/2/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED JOYCE HUBB

11/2/2021- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED JOYCE HUBB

SUMMONS ISSUED JOYCES TRUCKING INC

11/2/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED JOYCES TRUCKING INC

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

11/2/2021- D5- COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4023430

11/2/2021- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4023430

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JOYCE'S TRUCKING, INC. C/O REGISTERED AGENT ON 12-28-2021

1/3/2022- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JOYCE'S TRUCKING, INC. C/O REGISTERED AGENT ON 12-28-2021

AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/22/2022- D8- AMENDED COMPLAINT

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 12/27/21 @ 9:45 AM

3/22/2022- D9- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 12/27/21 @ 9:45 AM

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 12/27/21 @ 9:40 AM

3/22/2022- D10- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 12/27/21 @ 9:40 AM

SUMMONS ISSUED DFT. ( ALIAS ) JOYCE HUBB

3/22/2022- D11- SUMMONS ISSUED DFT. ( ALIAS ) JOYCE HUBB

SUMMONS ISSUED DFT. ( ALIAS ) JOYCE TRUCKING, INC.

3/22/2022- D12- SUMMONS ISSUED DFT. ( ALIAS ) JOYCE TRUCKING, INC.

CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4114726

3/22/2022- D13- CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4114726

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/23/2022 04:20PM PERSONAL, JOYCE HUBB

3/29/2022- D14- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/23/2022 04:20PM PERSONAL, JOYCE HUBB

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/23/2022 04:20PM SERVED A REGISTERED AGENT, JOYCE'S TRUCKING, INC

3/29/2022- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/23/2022 04:20PM SERVED A REGISTERED AGENT, JOYCE'S TRUCKING, INC

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFENDANT JOYCE HUBB

4/11/2022- D16- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFENDANT JOYCE HUBB

ORDER ON DEFEDANT'S EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR 30 DAYS

4/14/2022- D17- ORDER ON DEFEDANT'S EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR 30 DAYS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2022; ORDER ON DEFEDANT'S EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR 30 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/11/2022; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFENDANT JOYCE HUBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/29/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/23/2022 04:20PM SERVED A REGISTERED AGENT, JOYCE'S TRUCKING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/29/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/23/2022 04:20PM PERSONAL, JOYCE HUBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4114726

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED DFT. ( ALIAS ) JOYCE TRUCKING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED DFT. ( ALIAS ) JOYCE HUBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2022; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 12/27/21 @ 9:40 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/3/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON JOYCE'S TRUCKING, INC. C/O REGISTERED AGENT ON 12-28-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/3/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4023430

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/3/2021; COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/3/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED JOYCES TRUCKING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/3/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED JOYCE HUBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/3/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/3/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $8000 - $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen, James D III