This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/20/2022 at 00:50:01 (UTC).

PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC A/A/O VICTOR LOPEZ VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC A/A/O VICTOR LOPEZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC A/A/O VICTOR LOPEZ

401 East Las Olas Boulevard Suite 1220

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kanenbley, Peter Edward Jr

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 555S

Hollywood, FL 33021-6853

Defendant Attorney

Brown, Nataija Joyce

4686 Sunbeam Rd

Jacksonville, FL 32257-6189

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3835964

3/17/2021- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3835964

COVER SHEET

3/16/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

3/16/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

3/16/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFF

3/16/2021- D5- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

3/16/2021- D6- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF

3/16/2021- D7- REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

3/18/2021- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FORWARDED BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 03/24/2021 FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

3/24/2021- D11- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FORWARDED BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 03/24/2021 FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INS CO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NATAIJA BROWN FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - DEFENDANT

4/13/2021- D12- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NATAIJA BROWN FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - DEFENDANT

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

4/29/2021- D13- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF FILING (DEFENDANT'S) A CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

8/9/2021- D14- NOTICE OF FILING (DEFENDANT'S) A CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF'S

8/23/2021- D15- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF'S

Order Setting Hearing 9/7/2021 1:30 PM Hearing Room 721 - Kanenbley Chaplin, LLC

8/26/2021- D18- Order Setting Hearing 9/7/2021 1:30 PM Hearing Room 721 - Kanenbley Chaplin, LLC

Order Setting Hearing 9/7/2021 1:30 PM Hearing Room 721 - Cole, Scott, & Kissane, P.A.

8/26/2021- D19- Order Setting Hearing 9/7/2021 1:30 PM Hearing Room 721 - Cole, Scott, & Kissane, P.A.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : CHAMBERS; Courtroom : 721;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; Order Setting Hearing 9/7/2021 1:30 PM Hearing Room 721 - Cole, Scott, & Kissane, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; Order Setting Hearing 9/7/2021 1:30 PM Hearing Room 721 - Kanenbley Chaplin, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/24/2021; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/24/2021; CANCELLED PRETRIAL ON 9/7/2021 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/24/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2021; NOTICE OF FILING (DEFENDANT'S) A CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/30/2021; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT - CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NATAIJA BROWN FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/29/2021 1:30 PM - 503 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3835964

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2021; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC A/A/O VERONICA LIGONS is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kanenbley, Peter Edward Jr