This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/29/2023 at 07:13:20 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS MICHAEL MCGREGOR

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL MCGREGOR. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SACKS, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SACKS, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

Defendant

MICHAEL MCGREGOR

Jacksonville, FL 32257-6450

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

De Jesus, John Bacus

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/6/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/6/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHAEL MCGREGOR-PLAINTIFF

1/6/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHAEL MCGREGOR-PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4308746

1/8/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4308746

SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL MCGREGOR

1/8/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL MCGREGOR

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/12/2023 AT 04:51PM FOR MICHAEL MCGREGOR, INDIVIDUAL

1/12/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/12/2023 AT 04:51PM FOR MICHAEL MCGREGOR, INDIVIDUAL

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

2/23/2023- D9- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST MICHAEL MCGREGOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2023; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/12/2023 AT 04:51PM FOR MICHAEL MCGREGOR, INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS>$500/=<$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed: $175.00; Paid: $175.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/8/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL MCGREGOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/8/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 02/23/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/8/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4308746

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/8/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHAEL MCGREGOR-PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/8/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/8/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/8/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less