This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 08:04:07 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS JOHN PATTERSON

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN PATTERSON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

JOHN PATTERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

De Jesus, John Bacus

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

2/23/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

2/23/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JOHN PATTERSON -PLAINTIFF

2/23/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JOHN PATTERSON -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4340937

2/25/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4340937

SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN PATTERSON

2/25/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN PATTERSON

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 3-4-23 @ 06:20PM FOR JOHN PATTERSON, SUB-SERVED ON JILL PATTERSON (SPOUSE)

3/4/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 3-4-23 @ 06:20PM FOR JOHN PATTERSON, SUB-SERVED ON JILL PATTERSON (SPOUSE)

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

4/13/2023- D9- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2023; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 3-4-23 @ 06:20PM FOR JOHN PATTERSON, SUB-SERVED ON JILL PATTERSON (SPOUSE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN PATTERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/13/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4340937

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JOHN PATTERSON -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $5001 - $8000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less