This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/15/2023 at 06:11:52 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS JANELLE NELSON

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JANELLE NELSON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, AUDREY MCKIBBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, AUDREY MCKIBBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

Defendant

JANELLE NELSON

Jacksonville, FL 32225-6405

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

De Jesus, John Bacus

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/11/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/11/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JANELLE NELSON -PLAINTIFF

1/11/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JANELLE NELSON -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312100

1/13/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312100

SUMMONS ISSUED JANELLE NELSON

1/13/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED JANELLE NELSON

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 1-19-23 AT 2:05 P.M., (PERSONAL) ON JANELLE NELSON

1/19/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 1-19-23 AT 2:05 P.M., (PERSONAL) ON JANELLE NELSON

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT ADMIT

2/23/2023- D9- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT ADMIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2023; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT ADMIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/21/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 1-19-23 AT 2:05 P.M., (PERSONAL) ON JANELLE NELSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS>$500/=<$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed: $175.00; Paid: $175.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED JANELLE NELSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 02/23/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312100

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JANELLE NELSON -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less