This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/22/2023 at 20:05:08 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS DEBORAH BROTHERTON

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEBORAH BROTHERTON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

Defendant

DEBORAH BROTHERTON

Atlantic Bch, FL 32233-3478

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

De Jesus, John Bacus

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502-4952

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/11/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/11/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED DEBORAH BROTHERTON -PLAINTIFF

1/11/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED DEBORAH BROTHERTON -PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312095

1/13/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312095

SUMMONS ISSUED DEBORAH BROTHERTON

1/13/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED DEBORAH BROTHERTON

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED DEBORAH BROTHERTON

2/16/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED DEBORAH BROTHERTON

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

2/21/2023- D11- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379; Cancelled: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/22/2023; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2023; > CANCEL REASON - PLAINTIFF UNABLE TO PERFECT SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2023; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 2/23/2023 1:30:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED DEBORAH BROTHERTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS>$500/=<$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed: $175.00; Paid: $175.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED DEBORAH BROTHERTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 02/23/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312095

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED DEBORAH BROTHERTON -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less