This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/26/2023 at 14:05:47 (UTC).

PATRICIA KING VS MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 PATRICIA KING filed an Other lawsuit against MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEARING, KATIE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA KING

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Defendant

MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC ET AL

Registered Agent Solutions, Inc. 155 Office Plaza Dr., Suite A

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blackwell, Gregory Earl

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

Defendant Attorney

Jurman, Rory Eric

1 E Broward Blvd Ste 1010

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1866

 

Court Documents

MOTION (DEFT'S) FOR SANCTIONS

3/21/2023- D19- MOTION (DEFT'S) FOR SANCTIONS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

3/13/2023- D18- ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFENDANT'S) OF PLAINTIFF PATRICIA KING ON 4/11/23 AT 10:00AM VIA ZOOM

3/9/2023- D17- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFENDANT'S) OF PLAINTIFF PATRICIA KING ON 4/11/23 AT 10:00AM VIA ZOOM

MOTION TO COMPEL (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC EX PARTE) DISCOVERY

2/27/2023- D16- MOTION TO COMPEL (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC EX PARTE) DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

1/12/2023- D15- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

1/10/2023- D14- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

1/10/2023- D13- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

1/10/2023- D12- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

1/10/2023- D11- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

1/10/2023- D10- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

1/10/2023- D9- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RORY JURMAN FOR MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC ET AL

1/10/2023- D8- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RORY JURMAN FOR MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC ET AL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RORY JURMAN FOR MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC ET AL DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

1/3/2023- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RORY JURMAN FOR MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC ET AL DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 12/09/2022 @09:57AM MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC (CORPORATE)

12/12/2022- D6- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 12/09/2022 @09:57AM MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC (CORPORATE)

CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4278634

11/16/2022- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4278634

SUMMONS ISSUED - MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC

11/15/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED - MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC

COMPLAINT

11/15/2022- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

11/15/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/22/2023; MOTION (DEFT'S) FOR SANCTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2023; ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/9/2023; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFENDANT'S) OF PLAINTIFF PATRICIA KING ON 4/11/23 AT 10:00AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2023; MOTION TO COMPEL (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC EX PARTE) DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RORY JURMAN FOR MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC ET AL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/4/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RORY JURMAN FOR MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC ET AL DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/12/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 12/09/2022 @09:57AM MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC (CORPORATE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4278634

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED - MW FOREST APARTMENTS 1 LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less