This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/14/2022 at 00:58:31 (UTC).

PATRICIA DIANE LANOUX VS DONALD K LANOUX SR

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 PATRICIA DIANE LANOUX filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DONALD K LANOUX SR. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILENSKY, DANIEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILENSKY, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PATRICIA DIANE LANOUX

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Respondent

DONALD K LANOUX SR

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nichols, Eugene Bullard

300 W Adams St Ste 130

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4309

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Leombruno, John Philip

3840 Crown Point Rd Ste B

Jacksonville, FL 32257-5991

 

Court Documents

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

10/6/2021- D6- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

10/6/2021- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4001819

10/6/2021- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4001819

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - PATRICIA DIANE LANOUX / ATTRNY

10/6/2021- D3- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - PATRICIA DIANE LANOUX / ATTRNY

RESPONSE / DONALD LANOUX SR.

10/19/2021- D11- RESPONSE / DONALD LANOUX SR.

LETTER - DONALD LANOUX SR

11/12/2021- D15- LETTER - DONALD LANOUX SR

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - PATRICIA LANOUX

11/17/2021- D16- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - PATRICIA LANOUX

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DONALD K. LANOUX, RE: RESCHEDULING OF MEDIATION

11/17/2021- D17- LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DONALD K. LANOUX, RE: RESCHEDULING OF MEDIATION

MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

12/6/2021- D18- MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE /AGREEMENT SIGNED-TOTAL RESOLUTION

1/10/2022- D23- DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE /AGREEMENT SIGNED-TOTAL RESOLUTION

REQUEST (WIFES VERIFIED) FOR RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME

1/10/2022- D25- REQUEST (WIFES VERIFIED) FOR RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME

CHECKLIST FOR UNCONTESTED DIVORCES (4TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT)

1/11/2022- D24- CHECKLIST FOR UNCONTESTED DIVORCES (4TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT)

FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSENT) BOOK 20118 PAGE 1605-1613

1/24/2022- D26- FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSENT) BOOK 20118 PAGE 1605-1613

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 2/9/2022; NOTICE OF NON-REPRESENTATION AND NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF PATRICIA DIANE LANOUX/EUGENE B NICHOLS, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/25/2022; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: NICHOLS, EUGENE BULLARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/25/2022; FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CONSENT) BOOK 20118 PAGE 1605-1613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; CHECKLIST FOR UNCONTESTED DIVORCES (4TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE 1/20/22 AT 1:15PM, VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; REQUEST (WIFES VERIFIED) FOR RESTORATION OF FORMER NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2022; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE /AGREEMENT SIGNED-TOTAL RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/5/2022; NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE/PATRICIA DIANE LANOUX/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION IS GRANTED / PATRICIA DIANE LANOUX / JOHN LEOMBRUNO. ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/7/2021; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 01/10/2022 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM/JOHN P LEOMBRUNO-MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/6/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4001819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/6/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED - DONALD KENDELL LANOUX, SR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/6/2021; REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE RULES - DONALD KENDALL LANOUX, SR. / PATRICIA DIANE LANOUX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/6/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/6/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES - NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/6/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/6/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - PATRICIA DIANE LANOUX / ATTRNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/6/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/6/2021; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leombruno, John Philip