This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/05/2022 at 20:09:33 (UTC).

PATRICIA BROWN VS SAM'S EAST, INC. D/B/A SAM'S CLUB #8253

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 PATRICIA BROWN filed an Other lawsuit against SAM'S EAST, INC D/B/A SAM'S CLUB 8253. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA BROWN

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Defendant

SAM'S EAST, INC. D/B/A SAM'S CLUB #8253

300 Busch Drive

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Portnoy, Corey Jordan

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4148909

5/9/2022- D4- CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4148909

COVER SHEET

5/11/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

5/11/2022- D3- COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS -DEFTS

5/13/2022- D6- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS -DEFTS

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFTS) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

5/31/2022- D7- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFTS) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF

6/28/2022- D8- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF

6/28/2022- D9- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SAM'S EAST INC

7/12/2022- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TO SAM'S EAST INC

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4190973

7/12/2022- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4190973

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFT'S) OF PATRICIA BROWN ON 9/23/22 AT 1PM VIA ZOOM

7/20/2022- D12- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFT'S) OF PATRICIA BROWN ON 9/23/22 AT 1PM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) TO DEFT

7/25/2022- D13- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) TO DEFT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT

7/25/2022- D14- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) TO DEFT

7/25/2022- D15- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) TO DEFT

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

7/25/2022- D16- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFT'S) OF PATRICIA BROWN ON 9/23/22 AT 1PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4190973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SAM'S EAST INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/31/2022; ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFTS) TO PLTFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/16/2022; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS -DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4148909

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sam's East, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Portnoy, Corey Jordan