This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/17/2022 at 02:20:02 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION VS WONA W MANN A/K/A WONA MANN

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WONA W MANN A/K/A WONA MANN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DERKE, ELENI ELIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DERKE, ELENI ELIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

233 E. Bay Street, Suite 720

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

WONA W MANN A/K/A WONA MANN

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rolfe, Amanda Clay

233 E Bay St Ste 720

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3448

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/24/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

6/24/2022- D3- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED WONA W. MANN A/K/A WONA MANN-PLAINTIFF

6/24/2022- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED WONA W. MANN A/K/A WONA MANN-PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4179565

6/27/2022- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4179565

SUMMONS ISSUED WONA W. MANN A/K/A WONA MANN

6/27/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED WONA W. MANN A/K/A WONA MANN

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 07/19/2022 @01:55 PM FOR WONA W. MANN (SUBSTITUTE) BETTY MILLIGAN (SISTER)

7/21/2022- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 07/19/2022 @01:55 PM FOR WONA W. MANN (SUBSTITUTE) BETTY MILLIGAN (SISTER)

STIPULATION -SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

8/10/2022- D11- STIPULATION -SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT

8/11/2022- D9- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2022; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST - WONA MANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2022; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2022; STIPULATION -SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/25/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 07/19/2022 @01:55 PM FOR WONA W. MANN (SUBSTITUTE) BETTY MILLIGAN (SISTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=<$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/27/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED WONA W. MANN A/K/A WONA MANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/27/2022; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 08/11/2022 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/27/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4179565

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/27/2022; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED WONA W. MANN A/K/A WONA MANN-PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/27/2022; STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/27/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/27/2022; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROLFE, AMANDA CLAY