This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/22/2022 at 17:32:23 (UTC).

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF CRISIE DOMINGUEZ VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC AS ASSIGNEE OF CRISIE DOMINGUEZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HIGBEE, RONALD P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HIGBEE, RONALD P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF CRISIE DOMINGUEZ

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Defendant Attorney

Colbert, Tiffany Vanessa

390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801-1642

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

3/11/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

3/11/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

3/11/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3832947

3/15/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3832947

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TIFFANY COLBERT FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

4/13/2021- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TIFFANY COLBERT FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT'S) TO FILE RESPONSES TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

4/19/2021- D8- MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT'S) TO FILE RESPONSES TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

5/5/2021- D9- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

5/5/2021- D10- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

5/5/2021- D11- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

5/26/2021- D12- NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

8/27/2021- D13- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

8/27/2021- D14- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2021; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2021; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2021; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2021; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT'S) TO FILE RESPONSES TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL TIFFANY COLBERT FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3832947

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEAN VIEW HEALTH CHIROPRACTIC INC. A/A/O NICHOLE BYERS is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLBERT TIFFANY V