Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 09:14:33 (UTC).

OAKLEAF FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, INC. DBA OAKLEAF CHIROPRACTIC AND INJURY CENTER AS ASSIGNEE OF VICTORIA WATERS VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 OAKLEAF FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, INC DBA OAKLEAF CHIROPRACTIC AND INJURY CENTER AS ASSIGNEE OF VICTORIA WATERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OAKLEAF FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, INC. DBA OAKLEAF CHIROPRACTIC AND INJURY CENTER AS ASSIGNEE OF VICTORIA WATERS

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION C/O REGISTERED AGENT

4/9/2021- D6- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION C/O REGISTERED AGENT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION C/O REGISTERED AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

4/9/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION C/O REGISTERED AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

4/9/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

4/9/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855077

4/8/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855077

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION C/O REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION C/O REGISTERED AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855077

    Read MoreRead Less