Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 14:16:34 (UTC).

NORTHWEST FLORIDA PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC AAO JANNIE HIXON VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 NORTHWEST FLORIDA PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC AAO JANNIE HIXON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL, SCOTT F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MITCHELL, SCOTT F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHWEST FLORIDA PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC AAO JANNIE HIXON

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855145

4/8/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855145

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTER AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTER AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855145

    Read MoreRead Less