Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 09:13:55 (UTC).

NORTHWEST FLORIDA PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC AAO JANICE SNOWDEN VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 NORTHWEST FLORIDA PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC AAO JANICE SNOWDEN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KITE, LONDON M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KITE, LONDON M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHWEST FLORIDA PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC AAO JANICE SNOWDEN

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

 

Court Documents

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT

4/9/2021- D6- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT

COMPLAINT

4/9/2021- D4- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

4/9/2021- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET

4/9/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3854970

4/8/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3854970

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3854970

    Read MoreRead Less