Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 09:25:58 (UTC).

NORTHWEST FLORIDA PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC AAO CHRISTINA GRAHAM VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 NORTHWEST FLORIDA PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC AAO CHRISTINA GRAHAM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHWEST FLORIDA PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC AAO CHRISTINA GRAHAM

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

 

Court Documents

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTER AGENT

4/9/2021- D6- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTER AGENT

COMPLAINT

4/9/2021- D4- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTER AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

4/9/2021- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTER AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET

4/9/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855109

4/8/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855109

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTER AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTER AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855109

    Read MoreRead Less