This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/24/2023 at 23:14:55 (UTC).

NICOLE D REARDON Et Al VS KB HOME Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 NICOLE D REARDON filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AHO, MARIANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AHO, MARIANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TIMOTHY J REARDON

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

NICOLE D REARDON

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

KB HOME

C/O Corporation Service Company As Ra, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

KB HOME FLORIDA LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company As Ra, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company As Ra, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

3Rd Party Defendants

AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC.

PEDEL PAINTING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Brien, Neil Patrick

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683-2604

Other Attorneys

Chaaban, Dana

2 Miamicentral, 700 Nw 1St Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33136-4118

Heckert, Katherine Lee

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607-5780

Sutton, Rouselle Alton III

4767 New Broad St

Orlando, FL 32814-6405

Duran, Daniel

4767 New Broad St

Orlando, FL 32814-6405

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

9/26/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/26/2022- D3- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME

9/26/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

9/26/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

9/26/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4244167

9/26/2022- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4244167

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON KB HOME ON 10/25/22 AT 8:50AM

10/26/2022- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON KB HOME ON 10/25/22 AT 8:50AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON KB HOME FLORIDA LLC ON 10/25/22 AT 8:50AM

10/26/2022- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON KB HOME FLORIDA LLC ON 10/25/22 AT 8:50AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC ON 10/25/22 AT 8:50AM

10/26/2022- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC ON 10/25/22 AT 8:50AM

ANSWER AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC)

11/28/2022- D11- ANSWER AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC.

11/28/2022- D12- SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC.

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC.

11/28/2022- D13- MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC.

CASE FEES PAID: $405.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4285703

11/29/2022- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $405.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4285703

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROUSELLE SUTTON III FOR PEDEL PAINTING, INC. DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/1/2022- D15- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROUSELLE SUTTON III FOR PEDEL PAINTING, INC. DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC.

12/6/2022- D16- ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC.

LETTER TO JUDGE DEC 6, 2022

12/7/2022- D18- LETTER TO JUDGE DEC 6, 2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DANIEL DURAN FOR PEDEL PAINTING, INC.

12/8/2022- D17- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DANIEL DURAN FOR PEDEL PAINTING, INC.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/8/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DANIEL DURAN FOR PEDEL PAINTING, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/8/2022; LETTER TO JUDGE DEC 6, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/6/2022; ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/1/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROUSELLE SUTTON III FOR PEDEL PAINTING, INC. DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENCIV/COUNTER/X-CLAIM; Assessed: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $405.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4285703

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2022; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2022; ANSWER AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4244167

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME JACKSONVILLE, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/26/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE - CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KB HOME is a litigant

Latest cases where American Lathing Of North Florida Inc is a litigant