This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/18/2023 at 03:08:16 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS KENDALL TOWN CENTER EAST OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KENDALL TOWN CENTER EAST OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC

1615 S Congress Ave

Delray Beach, FL 33445

Defendants

UNKNKOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES SURVIVING SPSPOUSE, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEE, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER, OR AGAINST THE ESTAE OF VICKI J. WATSON A/K/A VICKI WATSON, DECEASED

Unknown, FL 00000

KENDALL TOWN CENTER EAST OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

920 3Rd Street, Suite B

Neptune Beach, FL 32266

TOWNHOMES OF KENDALL POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

110 Solana Road, Suite 102

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Jacksonville, FL 32225

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Guardian Ad Litem

GAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Poletti, Julia Y

5300 Atlantic Ave Ste 303

Delray Beach, FL 33484-8141

Defendant Attorney

McCabe, Michael John

110 Solana Rd Ste 102

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-5234

Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Kite-Powell, Julia Bliton

Po Box 18645

Tampa, FL 33679-8645

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT BY ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

2/27/2023- D39- ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT BY ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS JULIA B. KITE-POWELL, ESQ.

2/27/2023- D38- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS JULIA B. KITE-POWELL, ESQ.

NOTICE OF SERVICE ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

2/3/2023- D37- NOTICE OF SERVICE ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/GUARDIAN/ATTYAD LITEM - GRANTED

2/3/2023- D36- ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/GUARDIAN/ATTYAD LITEM - GRANTED

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST KENDALL TOWN CENTER EAST OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

2/2/2023- D35- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST KENDALL TOWN CENTER EAST OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - PLTF'S OTHER

2/1/2023- D34- MOTION FOR DEFAULT - PLTF'S OTHER

NOTICE OF SERVICE FORECLOSURE CMC ORDER AND MEMO

2/1/2023- D33- NOTICE OF SERVICE FORECLOSURE CMC ORDER AND MEMO

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CMC SET FOR: 03/24/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510 GAL ORDER TO BE ENTERED

1/30/2023- D32- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CMC SET FOR: 03/24/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510 GAL ORDER TO BE ENTERED

MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTY/GRDN/ADM AD LITEM (PLTF'S) AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW

1/23/2023- D30- MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTY/GRDN/ADM AD LITEM (PLTF'S) AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT # 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

1/23/2023- D29- NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT # 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

PROOF OF PUBLICATION N.O.A.

12/20/2022- D28- PROOF OF PUBLICATION N.O.A.

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CLAIM FOR SURPLUS

12/7/2022- D27- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CLAIM FOR SURPLUS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MICHAEL MCCABE FOR TOWNHOMES OF KENDALL POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

12/7/2022- D26- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MICHAEL MCCABE FOR TOWNHOMES OF KENDALL POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED ON UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, SURVIVING SPOUSE, GRANTEES, AS SIGNEE, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER, OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF VICKI J. WATSON A/K/A VI

12/6/2022- D25- NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED ON UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, SURVIVING SPOUSE, GRANTEES, AS SIGNEE, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER, OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF VICKI J. WATSON A/K/A VICKI WATSON, DECEASED

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4290544

12/6/2022- D24- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4290544

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED - PLTF'S

12/5/2022- D23- NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED - PLTF'S

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY ON UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, SURVIVING SPOUSE, GRANTEES, AS SIGNEE, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER, OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF VICKI J.

12/5/2022- D22- AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY ON UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, SURVIVING SPOUSE, GRANTEES, AS SIGNEE, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST BY, THROUGH, UNDER, OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF VICKI J. WATSON A/K/A VICKI WATSON, DECEASED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 ON 11-21-22 @ 7 PM

12/2/2022- D21- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 ON 11-21-22 @ 7 PM

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2023; ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT BY ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2023; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS JULIA B. KITE-POWELL, ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2023; ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR/GUARDIAN/ATTYAD LITEM - GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST KENDALL TOWN CENTER EAST OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2023; MOTION FOR DEFAULT - PLTF'S OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE FORECLOSURE CMC ORDER AND MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CMC SET FOR: 03/24/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510 GAL ORDER TO BE ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED ON TOWNHOMES OF KENDALL PAOINT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED ON KENDALL TOWN CENTER EAST OWNERS' ASSOCITION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20499 PAGE 1693-1693

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE (VERIFIED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less