This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/26/2022 at 00:21:43 (UTC).

NEUROTECH INC. A/A/O GERALD JOHNSON VS TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 NEUROTECH INC A/A/O GERALD JOHNSON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEUROTECH INC. A/A/O GERALD JOHNSON

Defendant

TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

8/4/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

8/4/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

8/4/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3956091

8/5/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3956091

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

8/5/2021- D7- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -PLAINTIFF

10/13/2021- D8- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

10/13/2021- D9- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

10/28/2021

HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021

DocketEntered: 10/18/2021; > CANCEL REASON - CASE DISMISSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021

DocketEntered: 10/18/2021; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 10/28/2021 1:30:00 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/18/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/18/2021; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM -PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021

FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021

FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/5/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021

DocketEntered: 8/5/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 10/28/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/5/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3956091

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/5/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/5/2021; COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/5/2021; COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2021

DocketEntered: 8/5/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

[+] Read More [-] Read Less