This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/03/2022 at 06:29:04 (UTC).

NEUROTECH INC. A/A/O EDNA KILGORE VS HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 NEUROTECH INC A/A/O EDNA KILGORE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEUROTECH INC. A/A/O EDNA KILGORE

Defendant

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

Defendant Attorney

Goettke, Lukas Dominic

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

7/30/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/30/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

7/30/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952487

8/2/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952487

PIP SUMMONS ISSUED HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

8/2/2021- D7- PIP SUMMONS ISSUED HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FORWARDED BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 09/22/2021 FOR HARTFORD CASUALTY INS CO

10/7/2021- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FORWARDED BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 09/22/2021 FOR HARTFORD CASUALTY INS CO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LUKAS GOETTKE FOR HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - DEFENDANT

10/13/2021- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LUKAS GOETTKE FOR HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - DEFENDANT

ANSWER (DEFENDANT'S)

10/13/2021- D10- ANSWER (DEFENDANT'S)

MOTION TO INVOKE (DEFENDANT'S) THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

10/13/2021- D11- MOTION TO INVOKE (DEFENDANT'S) THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AGREED)

10/21/2021- D12- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AGREED)

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL - HEARING TO BE SET CALL TO SET

10/21/2021- D13- PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL - HEARING TO BE SET CALL TO SET

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT -DENY

10/21/2021- D14- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT -DENY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING PAYMENTS AND INTEREST - PLAINTIFF

3/25/2022- D15- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING PAYMENTS AND INTEREST - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) RE: EOB & PIP LOG

3/25/2022- D16- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) RE: EOB & PIP LOG

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

4/8/2022- D17- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 4/11/2022; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 3/25/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) RE: EOB & PIP LOG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 3/25/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING PAYMENTS AND INTEREST - PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2021

HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT -DENY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/22/2021; PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL - HEARING TO BE SET CALL TO SET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/21/2021; ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AGREED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/14/2021; MOTION TO INVOKE (DEFENDANT'S) THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/14/2021; ANSWER (DEFENDANT'S)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/14/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LUKAS GOETTKE FOR HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 10/8/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FORWARDED BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON 09/22/2021 FOR HARTFORD CASUALTY INS CO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=<$500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 10/21/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952487

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

[+] Read More [-] Read Less