Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 14:18:31 (UTC).

NEUROTECH INC AAO CHRISTOPHER LAFONTAINE VS USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 NEUROTECH INC AAO CHRISTOPHER LAFONTAINE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEUROTECH INC AAO CHRISTOPHER LAFONTAINE

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855068

4/8/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855068

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS=>$100/=; Assessed : $80.00; Paid : $80.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; PIP SUMMONS ISSUED TO USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY C/O REGISTERED AGENT ,PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $101 - $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $90.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3855068

    Read MoreRead Less