Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 06/08/2021 at 00:05:28 (UTC).

NEDRICK SHAMAR JOHNSON VS FEDELINE DERILUS JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 NEDRICK SHAMAR JOHNSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FEDELINE DERILUS JOHNSON. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GUY, JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GUY, JOHN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NEDRICK SHAMAR JOHNSON

678-234-3226, FL 32218

Respondent

FEDELINE DERILUS JOHNSON

Camarillo, CA 93010

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

5/24/2021- D20- NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

4/22/2021- D14- NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862334

4/15/2021- D13- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862334

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

4/16/2021- D11- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2021; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION 07/08/2021 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2021; NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/24/2021; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 7/8/2021 @ 9:00AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/14/2021; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION SEPARATE YET TOGETHER, FAMILIES ARE FOREVER, FAMILY STABILIZATION COURSE/NEDRICK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2021; PARTIES' PROPOSED PARENTING PLAN -NEDRICK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2021; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -NEDRICK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2021; ANSWER OF WIFE -FEDELINE DERILUS JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/22/2021; NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/POSTAL CHARGES/FAM SERV/$12; Assessed : $12.00; Paid : $12.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3862334

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT / NEDRICK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WITH CHILDREN - NEDRICK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT / NEDRICK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS - AMY ALEXANDER FOR NEDRICK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; MOTION TO DEVIATE FROM CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES GUIDELINES/ NEDRICK JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)/ NEDRICK JOHNSON (PRO SE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less