This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/31/2023 at 00:19:25 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS ESTATE OF RONALD L GRANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ESTATE OF RONALD L GRANT. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

THERESA GRANT

RIVER GREEN ESTATES LLC

ESTATE OF RONALD L GRANT

MVREALTY PBC LLC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION I

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF THERESA GRANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Sara Beth

 

Court Documents

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 06/30/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510; NOT AT ISSUE

5/26/2023- D56- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 06/30/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510; NOT AT ISSUE

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 06/30/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510

5/26/2023- D55- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 06/30/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510

NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER

5/22/2023- D53- NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST MV REALTY PBC LLC, UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

5/17/2023- D52- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST MV REALTY PBC LLC, UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

5/15/2023- D51- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MV REALTY PBC LLC, UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 OTHER

5/15/2023- D50- MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MV REALTY PBC LLC, UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 OTHER

NOTICE OF HEARING (CROSS) OF 05/25/2023 @900AM VIA ZOOM

5/15/2023- D49- NOTICE OF HEARING (CROSS) OF 05/25/2023 @900AM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF THERESA GRANT

5/15/2023- D48- NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF THERESA GRANT

RESPONSE (PLTFS) IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS

5/11/2023- D47- RESPONSE (PLTFS) IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT THERESA GRANT

5/10/2023- D46- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT THERESA GRANT

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4400413

5/9/2023- D45- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4400413

SUMMONS ISSUED ON ESTATE OF RONALD L. GRANT (ALIAS)

5/9/2023- D44- SUMMONS ISSUED ON ESTATE OF RONALD L. GRANT (ALIAS)

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, THERESA GRANT

5/1/2023- D43- ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, THERESA GRANT

MOTION TO DISMISS VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE (IN REM) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (DEFT'S)

4/24/2023- D42- MOTION TO DISMISS VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE (IN REM) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (DEFT'S)

ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND HAS (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER (AGREED)

4/10/2023- D41- ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND HAS (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER (AGREED)

MOTION TO WITHDRAW , WITH CONSENT, AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, THERESA GRANT OTHER

4/6/2023- D40- MOTION TO WITHDRAW , WITH CONSENT, AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, THERESA GRANT OTHER

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 05/25/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510; DEFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION GRANTED 30 DAYS

3/31/2023- D39- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 05/25/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510; DEFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION GRANTED 30 DAYS

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND HAS (30) DAYS FROM THIS ORDER TO FILE (AGREED)

3/27/2023- D36- ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND HAS (30) DAYS FROM THIS ORDER TO FILE (AGREED)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/30/2023; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 06/30/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510; NOT AT ISSUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/30/2023; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO CMC SET FOR: 06/30/2023 @ 09:00AM IN COURTROOM 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketEntered: 5/25/2023; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/30/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 -PER COURT CALENDAR 5/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/24/2023; NOTICE OF FILING - PROPOSED FORECLOSURE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST MV REALTY PBC LLC, UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2023; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2023; MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MV REALTY PBC LLC, UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2023; NOTICE OF HEARING (CROSS) OF 05/25/2023 @900AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED MV REALTY PBC LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO ESTATE OF RONALD L GRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO RIVER GREEN ESTATES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO THERESA GRANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20564 PAGE 1666-1667

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less