This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/06/2023 at 18:13:30 (UTC).

M&T BANK VS MAURICE ELRINGTON JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MAURICE ELRINGTON JR. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T BANK

Defendants

SIAH B ELRINGTON

MAURICE ELRINGTON JR

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saeed, Aamir Hayat

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/6/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT (VERIFIED)

1/6/2023- D3- COMPLAINT (VERIFIED)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20550 PAGE 1043-1043

1/6/2023- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20550 PAGE 1043-1043

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

1/6/2023- D5- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED SIAJ B ELRINGTON

1/6/2023- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED SIAJ B ELRINGTON

SUMMONS ISSUED MAURICE ELRINGTON JR

1/6/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED MAURICE ELRINGTON JR

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

1/6/2023- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

1/6/2023- D9- NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

CASE FEES PAID: $1,076.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4310202

1/6/2023- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $1,076.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4310202

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/14/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

1/10/2023- D12- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/14/2023 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM OTHER

1/12/2023- D14- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM OTHER

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 20556 PAGE 1028-1029

1/12/2023- D15- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 20556 PAGE 1028-1029

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 20556 PAGE 1028-1029 RECORDED DOCUMENT

1/18/2023- D16- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 20556 PAGE 1028-1029 RECORDED DOCUMENT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: Case Management Conference; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 510; Cancelled: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/23/2023; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/23/2023; CANCELLED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/14/2023 9:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 20556 PAGE 1028-1029 RECORDED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 20556 PAGE 1028-1029

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/FORECLOSURE >50-<250K 5/25/2021; Assessed: $1,046.00; Paid: $1,046.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $1,076.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4310202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2023; NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED MAURICE ELRINGTON JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED SIAJ B ELRINGTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2023; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2023; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 20550 PAGE 1043-1043

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2023; COMPLAINT (VERIFIED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/10/2023; NON-HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE $50,001 - $249,999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less