This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/20/2023 at 22:04:53 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS PAULA BITTINGER

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PAULA BITTINGER. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, AUDREY MCKIBBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, AUDREY MCKIBBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

PAULA BITTINGER

Jacksonville, FL 32221-2536

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Johan Alexi

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687-0335

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/11/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/11/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED PAULA BITTINGER

1/11/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED PAULA BITTINGER

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312427

1/13/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312427

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/21/23 @ 4:56PM TO PAULA BITTINGER, SUBSTITUTE, ADAM BITTENGER, CO-RESIDENT - PLAINTIFF

1/21/2023- D6- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/21/23 @ 4:56PM TO PAULA BITTINGER, SUBSTITUTE, ADAM BITTENGER, CO-RESIDENT - PLAINTIFF

ANSWER /RESPONSE TO ALLEGATIONS-FILED BY DEFT PAULA BITTINGER

2/17/2023- D7- ANSWER /RESPONSE TO ALLEGATIONS-FILED BY DEFT PAULA BITTINGER

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLAINTIFF'S)

3/1/2023- D8- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLAINTIFF'S)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2023; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2023; ANSWER /RESPONSE TO ALLEGATIONS-FILED BY DEFT PAULA BITTINGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/23/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/21/23 @ 4:56PM TO PAULA BITTINGER, SUBSTITUTE, ADAM BITTENGER, CO-RESIDENT - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed: $300.00; Paid: $300.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4312427

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED PAULA BITTINGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/13/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $8000 - $15000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less