This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 10/18/2021 at 01:02:59 (UTC).

MIDFIRST BANK VS ASHJA TAKIRA THOMPSON Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 MIDFIRST BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ASHJA TAKIRA THOMPSON. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDFIRST BANK

12425 28Th St North Ste 200

St Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendants

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS GRANTEES DEVISEES LIENORS TRUSTEES AND CREDITORS OF MICHELE MCGRADY A/K/A MICHELE ELAINE MCGRADY A/K/A MICHELE ELAINE MCCRARY MCGRADY DECEASED

ASHJA TAKIRA THOMPSON

Jacksonville, FL 32277

TARYN KINSHASA NICOLE THOMPSON

Jacksonville, FL 32277

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Jacksonville, FL 32277-2674

UNKOWN TENANT 2

Jacksonville, FL 32277-2674

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

820 Follin Lane

Vienna, VA 22180

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

400 North Tampa Street, Suite 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosenberg, Anna Judd

12425 28Th St N Ste 200

Saint Petersburg, FL 33716-1826

Defendant Attorney

Gufford, Charles Porter

225 E Robinson St Ste 155

Orlando, FL 32801-4326

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

9/16/2021- D3- COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO DEFTS TARYN THOMPSON AND ASHJA THOMPSON

10/14/2021- D31- MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO DEFTS TARYN THOMPSON AND ASHJA THOMPSON

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CHARLES GUFFORD FOR NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

10/13/2021- D28- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CHARLES GUFFORD FOR NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1 ON 9/23/21 @ 5:15 PM

10/11/2021- D26- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1 ON 9/23/21 @ 5:15 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ON 9/23/21 @ 11:12 AM

10/11/2021- D24- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ON 9/23/21 @ 11:12 AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - ASHJA TAKIRA THOMPSON A/K/A ASHJA THOMPSON ON 9/23/21 @ 5:15 PM

10/11/2021- D22- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - ASHJA TAKIRA THOMPSON A/K/A ASHJA THOMPSON ON 9/23/21 @ 5:15 PM

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4003532

10/7/2021- D20- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4003532

AFFIDAVIT OF SWORN STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, GRANTEES, DEVISEES, LIENORS, TRUSTEES, AND CREDITORS OF MICHELE MCGRADY A/K/A MICHELE ELAINE MCGRADY A/K/A MICHELE ELAINE MCCRARY MCGRADY, DECEASED

10/7/2021- D19- AFFIDAVIT OF SWORN STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, GRANTEES, DEVISEES, LIENORS, TRUSTEES, AND CREDITORS OF MICHELE MCGRADY A/K/A MICHELE ELAINE MCGRADY A/K/A MICHELE ELAINE MCCRARY MCGRADY, DECEASED

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED

10/7/2021- D18- NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( PLAINTIFF'S ) OF NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE- COPY PROVIDED TO ALL ON SERVICE LIST

9/21/2021- D17- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( PLAINTIFF'S ) OF NOTICE/ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE- COPY PROVIDED TO ALL ON SERVICE LIST

CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 11/16/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

9/17/2021- D15- CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 11/16/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,111.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3987418

9/16/2021- D13- CASE FEES PAID: $1,111.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3987418

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKOWN TENANT 2

9/16/2021- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS ISSUED - NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

9/16/2021- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED - NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

SUMMONS ISSUED - TARYN KINSHASA NICOLE THOMPSON A/K/A TARYN THOMPSON

9/16/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED - TARYN KINSHASA NICOLE THOMPSON A/K/A TARYN THOMPSON

SUMMONS ISSUED - ASHJA TAKIRA THOMPSON A/K/A ASHJA THOMPSON

9/16/2021- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED - ASHJA TAKIRA THOMPSON A/K/A ASHJA THOMPSON

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

9/16/2021- D4- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COVER SHEET

9/16/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Managment Conference; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/15/2021; MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO DEFTS TARYN THOMPSON AND ASHJA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/15/2021; NOTICE OF FILING MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( DEFENDANT, NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION'S ) TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CHARLES GUFFORD FOR NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ON 9/23/21 @ 2:05 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1 ON 9/23/21 @ 5:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - UNKNOWN TENANT 1 ON 9/23/21 @ 5:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ON 9/23/21 @ 11:12 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - TARYN KINSHASA NICOLE THOMPSON A/K/A TARYN THOMPSON ON 9/23/21 @ 4:55 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED - NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED - TARYN KINSHASA NICOLE THOMPSON A/K/A TARYN THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED - ASHJA TAKIRA THOMPSON A/K/A ASHJA THOMPSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19925 PAGE 931-931

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2021; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Midfirst Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Navy Federal Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUFFORD, CHARLES