This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/12/2023 at 02:10:50 (UTC).

MICHELLE BOOKER VS NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 MICHELLE BOOKER filed an Other lawsuit against NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALLACE, III, WADDELL A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHELLE BOOKER

Jacksonville, FL 32205

Defendants

NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, LLC

Vcorp Services, Llc, Registered Agent 1200 S. Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

WOODLAND GROVE NH LLC

Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blackwell, Gregory Earl

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

Defendant Attorney

Renaldo, Anthony Joseph

Penthouse Suite H, 1191 E Newport Center Dr

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442-7715

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4279020

11/14/2022- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4279020

COVER SHEET

11/15/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/15/2022- D3- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED -NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES LLC

11/15/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED -NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED WOODLAND GROVE NH LLC

11/15/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED WOODLAND GROVE NH LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/04/2023 10:52AM CORPORATE SERVICE, NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, LLC

1/9/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/04/2023 10:52AM CORPORATE SERVICE, NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/04/2023 11:55AM SERVED A CORPORATE PARTNERSHIP, WOODLAND GROVE NH, LLC DBA WOODLAND GROVE HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER

1/9/2023- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/04/2023 11:55AM SERVED A CORPORATE PARTNERSHIP, WOODLAND GROVE NH, LLC DBA WOODLAND GROVE HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY RENALDO FOR NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, LLC

1/17/2023- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY RENALDO FOR NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, LLC

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - DEFT

2/27/2023- D12- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - DEFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2023; ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY RENALDO FOR NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/04/2023 11:55AM SERVED A CORPORATE PARTNERSHIP, WOODLAND GROVE NH, LLC DBA WOODLAND GROVE HEALTH & REHABILITATION CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/9/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 01/04/2023 10:52AM CORPORATE SERVICE, NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED WOODLAND GROVE NH LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED -NEXT LEVEL HOSPITALITY SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4279020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less