This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/23/2023 at 21:02:05 (UTC).

MICHAEL RICHARDSON VS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 MICHAEL RICHARDSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEARING, KATIE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL RICHARDSON

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

One Geico Plaza

Washington, DC 20815

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Staggard, Richard Arthur

Attorney at Farah and Farah P.A.

10 W Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3618

Defendant Attorney

Nepowada, Joseph

200 W Forsyth St Ste 1420

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4326

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/31/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/31/2023- D3- COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

1/31/2023- D4- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

1/31/2023- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

1/31/2023- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4323833

2/1/2023- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4323833

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY ON 2/7/23

2/8/2023- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY ON 2/7/23

ANSWER (DEFT GEICO'S) AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/27/2023- D9- ANSWER (DEFT GEICO'S) AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOSEPH NEPOWADA FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

2/27/2023- D10- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOSEPH NEPOWADA FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/27/2023- D11- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)

2/27/2023- D12- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S)

2/27/2023- D13- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

3/14/2023- D14- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RICHARD STAGGARD FOR MICHAEL RICHARDSON AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

3/17/2023- D15- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RICHARD STAGGARD FOR MICHAEL RICHARDSON AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RICHARD STAGGARD FOR MICHAEL RICHARDSON AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/14/2023; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2023; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOSEPH NEPOWADA FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2023; ANSWER (DEFT GEICO'S) AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY ON 2/7/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4323833

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less