This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/23/2022 at 08:03:58 (UTC).

MICHAEL CALDWELL VS JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 MICHAEL CALDWELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AHO, MARIANNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AHO, MARIANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL CALDWELL

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant

JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY

21 West Church Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morrison, Rebecca

50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3664

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Wirtz, Gregg L

329 Royal Tern Rd S

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-6208

 

Court Documents

DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -IMPASSE

2/7/2022- D37- DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -IMPASSE

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S)

2/4/2022- D36- NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S)

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT

2/2/2022- D35- NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLTFS) TO DEFTS JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY

2/2/2022- D34- NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLTFS) TO DEFTS JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S SECOND) TO PLAINTIFF

2/1/2022- D33- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S SECOND) TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S) TO PLAINTIFF

2/1/2022- D32- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S) TO PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

2/1/2022- D31- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY (DEFT JEA'S)

1/19/2022- D30- CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY (DEFT JEA'S)

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT

6/24/2021- D18- NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE-P/T 09/30/22 @ 10:00 A.M., RM 704

12/17/2021- D28- ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE-P/T 09/30/22 @ 10:00 A.M., RM 704

MEMO SETTING TRIAL DATE

12/15/2021- D27- MEMO SETTING TRIAL DATE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 01/31/2022 @900AM AT JAX MEDIATION CENTER

11/9/2021- D26- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 01/31/2022 @900AM AT JAX MEDIATION CENTER

MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL - PLTF

11/8/2021- D25- MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL - PLTF

NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

11/5/2021- D24- NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTF

9/24/2021- D23- REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S)

9/24/2021- D22- NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF.'S AMENDED) FROM DEFT., JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY

7/29/2021- D21- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF.'S AMENDED) FROM DEFT., JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY DEFT

4/28/2021- D12- REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY DEFT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:30 AM; Type : JURY TRIAL; Location : NO COURT ROOM ENTERED; Courtroom : 0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/8/2022; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -IMPASSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2022; NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLTFS) TO DEFTS JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S SECOND) TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S) TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/19/2022; CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY (DEFT JEA'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 12/20/2021; JURY TRIAL 10/10/2022 9:30 AM - 0 NO COURT ROOM ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3851195

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT., JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., JEA (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY - PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JACKSONVILLE ELECTRIC AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wirtz, Gregg L