This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/23/2022 at 15:05:30 (UTC).

MEREDITH LORD VS LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 MEREDITH LORD filed an Other lawsuit against LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEREDITH LORD

St Augustine, FL 32084

Defendants

LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

LOWES HOME IMPROVEMENT, LLC

1000 Lowe'S Boulevard

Mooresville, NC 28117

LOWES HOME IMPROVEMENTS INC.

270 43Rd Ter Se

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

LOWE'S HOME RENOVATIONS, LLC

2875 South Ocean Boulevard, Suite 200

Palm Beach, FL 33480

LOWE'S INTERNATIONAL INC.

420 12Th Street West

Bradenton, FL 33505

LOWES INTERNATIONAL CORP

19911 Cutler Court

Miami, FL 33189

LOWES OF JACKSONVILLE, FLA INC

Monroe Street And Pensacola Street

Tallahassee, FL 32304

LOWE'S LANDSCAPE AND GARDENER LLC

146 San Remo Boulevard

North Lauderdale, FL 33068

LOWE'S LANDSCAPING LLC

2119 Nw 28Th Place

Gainesville, FL 32605

LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

1201 Hays Street

Mooresville, NC 28117

LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENT, LLC

1000 Lowe'S Boulevard

Mooresville, NC 28117

LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENTS INC.

270 43Rd Ter Se

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

LOWE'S INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

19911 Cutler Court

Miami, FL 33189

LOWE'S OF JACKSONVILLE, FLA INC

Monroe Street And Pensacola Street

Tallahassee, FL 32304

LOWE'S

LOWE'S HIW INC

LOWE'S COMPANIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lechner, Albert Heinz

2601 N Ponce De Leon Blvd

St Augustine, FL 32084-2642

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

6/24/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/24/2022- D3- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, INC.

6/24/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENT, LLC

6/24/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENT, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

6/24/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME RENOVATIONS, LLC

6/24/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME RENOVATIONS, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S INTERNATIONAL, INC.

6/24/2022- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S INTERNATIONAL, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S INTERNATIONAL, CORP.

6/24/2022- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S INTERNATIONAL, CORP.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S OF JACKSONVILLE, FLA, INC.

6/24/2022- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S OF JACKSONVILLE, FLA, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S LANDSCAPE AND GARDENER, LLC

6/24/2022- D11- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S LANDSCAPE AND GARDENER, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S LANDSCAPING LLC

6/24/2022- D12- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S LANDSCAPING LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

6/24/2022- D13- SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

CASE FEES PAID: $501.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4181177

6/28/2022- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $501.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4181177

AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/1/2022- D16- AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/2/2022; AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S OF JACKSONVILLE, FLA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S INTERNATIONAL, CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME RENOVATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME IMPROVEMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2022; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWE'S HIW INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Improvement is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant