This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/29/2022 at 15:34:15 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC VS BOBBIE ROBINSON Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BOBBIE ROBINSON. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FELTEL JR, GILBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FELTEL JR, GILBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC

Po Box 997542

Sacramento, CA 95899

Defendants

JASON ROBINSON

Jacksonville, FL 32206

BOBBIE ROBINSON

Jacksonville, FL 32209

RODERICK DANIEL

Jacksonville, FL 32209

MONIQUE FERGUSON

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilson, Paul Edward Jr

1776 N Pine Island Rd Ste 308

Plantation, FL 33322-5235

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/31/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) OF REPLEVIN AND PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

1/31/2022- D3- COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) OF REPLEVIN AND PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOBBIE D. ROBINSON

1/31/2022- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOBBIE D. ROBINSON

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONIQUE FERGUSON

1/31/2022- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONIQUE FERGUSON

SUMMONS ISSUED TO RODERICK DANIEL

1/31/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO RODERICK DANIEL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JASON L. ROBINSON

1/31/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO JASON L. ROBINSON

CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4077078

1/31/2022- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4077078

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4077078

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JASON L. ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO RODERICK DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO MONIQUE FERGUSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOBBIE D. ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2022; COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) OF REPLEVIN AND PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2022; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilson, Paul E