This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 08/27/2021 at 15:05:11 (UTC).

MATTHEW W. FORSHEE VS HAYWARD CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 MATTHEW W FORSHEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAYWARD CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberson, Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Roberson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW W. FORSHEE

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD

Green Cove Springs, FL 32043

HAYWARD CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC

600 Big Oak Road Lot D

St. Augustine, FL 32095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pecko, Mark Antoine

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952283

8/2/2021- D12- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952283

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT., HAYWARD CONTRUCTION GROUP, LLC (PLTF INITIAL)

7/30/2021- D11- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT., HAYWARD CONTRUCTION GROUP, LLC (PLTF INITIAL)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT., SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD (PLTF)

7/30/2021- D10- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT., SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD (PLTF)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., HAYWARD CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC (PLTF FIRST)

7/30/2021- D9- REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., HAYWARD CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC (PLTF FIRST)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD (PLTF FIRST)

7/30/2021- D8- REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD (PLTF FIRST)

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD (PLTF ORIGINAL)

7/30/2021- D7- NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD (PLTF ORIGINAL)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., HAYWARD CONSTRUCTON GROUP,LLC (INITIAL)-PLTF

7/30/2021- D6- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., HAYWARD CONSTRUCTON GROUP,LLC (INITIAL)-PLTF

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HAYWARD CONSTRUCTION GROUP,LLC

7/30/2021- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO HAYWARD CONSTRUCTION GROUP,LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD

7/30/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD

COMPLAINT

7/30/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

7/30/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3952283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT., HAYWARD CONTRUCTION GROUP, LLC (PLTF INITIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT., SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., HAYWARD CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC (PLTF FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD (PLTF FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD (PLTF ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., HAYWARD CONSTRUCTON GROUP,LLC (INITIAL)-PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO HAYWARD CONSTRUCTION GROUP,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SCOT F. BEDINGFIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2021; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pecko, Mark Antoine