Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 06/01/2021 at 08:53:47 (UTC).

MARY L CRAWLEY VS ROBERT M CRAWLEY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 MARY L CRAWLEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBERT M CRAWLEY. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAY, LANCE M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAY, LANCE M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARY L CRAWLEY

Jacksonville, FL 32222

Respondent

ROBERT M CRAWLEY

Bessemer City, NC 28016

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

5/6/2021- D14- NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

4/15/2021- D12- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860688

4/15/2021- D2- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860688

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/20/2021; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS /MARY L CRAWLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/20/2021; AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS /EMMA RAYO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/20/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES /NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2021; NOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2021; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/POSTAL CHARGES/FAM SERV/$12; Assessed : $12.00; Paid : $12.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /MARY CRAWLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /ROBERT M. CRAWLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; ANSWER AND WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; PROOF OF RESIDENCY /MARY CRAWLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3860688

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less