This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/14/2022 at 02:16:39 (UTC).

MARY A VACCARO VS ADEM BIRDAL Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 MARY A VACCARO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADEM BIRDAL. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARY A VACCARO

Ponte Vedra, FL 32081

Defendants

TAKAY FARUK

Jacksonville, FL 32256

ADEM BIRDAL

Jacksonville, FL 32256

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

9800 Fredericksburg Rd.

San Antonio, TX 78288

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Flaherty, Brian Martin

Attorney at Farah and Farah P A

10 W Adams St Fl 3

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3615

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Coulson, Michael Irwin

Attorney at Michael I Coulson P A

320 1St St N Ste 708

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250-6943

Other Attorneys

Smith, Michelle Leigh

Attorney at Law Office of Terryl B. Walker

Law Office Of Terryl B. Walker, 901 North Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

7/14/2022- D62- NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES -DEFENDANT, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

7/14/2022- D61- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES -DEFENDANT, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

WITNESS LIST (PLAINTIFF'S FACT)

6/29/2022- D59- WITNESS LIST (PLAINTIFF'S FACT)

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT. USAA GEN. IND. CO.

6/17/2022- D58- CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT. USAA GEN. IND. CO.

REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTF

6/9/2022- D57- REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTF

REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTF

6/9/2022- D56- REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTF

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA MEDEX CLINIC, MAYO CLINIC HOSPITAL, MAYO CLINIC, AGEWELL CENTER FOR HEALTH, BAPTIST PRIMARY CARE PONTE VEDRA

6/6/2022- D55- NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA MEDEX CLINIC, MAYO CLINIC HOSPITAL, MAYO CLINIC, AGEWELL CENTER FOR HEALTH, BAPTIST PRIMARY CARE PONTE VEDRA

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION /DEFENDANT USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY/ATTY

6/6/2022- D54- CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION /DEFENDANT USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY/ATTY

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

6/6/2022- D52- ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL (CASE MANAGEMENT) AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE P/T 10/09/2023 @1020AM RM739

6/6/2022- D51- ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL (CASE MANAGEMENT) AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE P/T 10/09/2023 @1020AM RM739

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY)

6/2/2022- D50- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY)

PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFENDANT USA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY'S)

6/2/2022- D49- PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFENDANT USA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY)

6/2/2022- D48- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY)

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

6/1/2022- D47- CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT

5/24/2022- D46- NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

5/23/2022- D45- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

5/23/2022- D44- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS) TO DEFTS

5/19/2022- D43- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS) TO DEFTS

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2023
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:30 AM; Type : JURY TRIAL; Location : NO COURT ROOM ENTERED; Courtroom : 0;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/15/2022; > CANCEL REASON - MOVED TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/15/2022; CANCELLED JURY TRIAL ON 10/23/2023 9:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/15/2022; NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES -DEFENDANT, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; WITNESS LIST (PLAINTIFF'S FACT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT. USAA GEN. IND. CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2022; REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2022; REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/7/2022; NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA MEDEX CLINIC, MAYO CLINIC HOSPITAL, MAYO CLINIC, AGEWELL CENTER FOR HEALTH, BAPTIST PRIMARY CARE PONTE VEDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT ADEM BIRDAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2022; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4119841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO ADEM BIRDAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO TAKAY FARUK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2022; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smith, Michelle Leigh