This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/16/2022 at 15:11:53 (UTC).

MANDI GRANTHAM VS CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 MANDI GRANTHAM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANDI GRANTHAM

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO

Jacksonville, FL 32218-7575

SUNBELT RENTALS, INC.

C/O Danny Chipp2015 Directors Row

Orlando, FL 32809

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Newsome, Curtis Richard

Newsome Melton201 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801-3482

Stern, Michael Jesse

201 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801-3482

Penagos, Melanie Morgan

201 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801-3482

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFT SUNBELT RENTALS INC

12/20/2021- D21- REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFT SUNBELT RENTALS INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) SUNBELT

12/20/2021- D20- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) SUNBELT

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

12/15/2021- D19- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) TO DEFTS SUNBELT RENTAL INC AND CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO'S ANSWER &/ TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

12/15/2021- D18- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) TO DEFTS SUNBELT RENTAL INC AND CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO'S ANSWER &/ TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON SUNBELT RENTALS INC ON 11/16/21 AT 11:24AM

12/7/2021- D17- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON SUNBELT RENTALS INC ON 11/16/21 AT 11:24AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO ON 12/4/21 AT 9:04AM

12/7/2021- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO ON 12/4/21 AT 9:04AM

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

12/6/2021- D15- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

ORDER ON MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR-GRANTED

11/29/2021- D14- ORDER ON MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR-GRANTED

LETTER TO JUDGE DEES FROM M. JESSE STERN (NOVEMBER 24, 2021)

11/24/2021- D13- LETTER TO JUDGE DEES FROM M. JESSE STERN (NOVEMBER 24, 2021)

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4026246

11/8/2021- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4026246

COMPLAINT

11/5/2021- D9- COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO

11/5/2021- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT SUNBELT RENTALS INC

11/5/2021- D7- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT SUNBELT RENTALS INC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) DIRECTED TO DEFT CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO

11/5/2021- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) DIRECTED TO DEFT CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) DIRECTED TO DEFT SUNBELT RENTALS INC

11/5/2021- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) DIRECTED TO DEFT SUNBELT RENTALS INC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO

11/5/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUNBELT RENTALS INC

11/5/2021- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUNBELT RENTALS INC

COVER SHEET

11/5/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFT SUNBELT RENTALS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFT'S) SUNBELT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2021; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE FOR A JURY TRIAL IN A GENERAL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2021; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLTF'S) TO DEFTS SUNBELT RENTAL INC AND CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO'S ANSWER &/ TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/8/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON SUNBELT RENTALS INC ON 11/16/21 AT 11:24AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/8/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO ON 12/4/21 AT 9:04AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/6/2021; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT'S) TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/30/2021; ORDER ON MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR-GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/29/2021; LETTER TO JUDGE DEES FROM M. JESSE STERN (NOVEMBER 24, 2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/21/2021; MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR -PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4026246

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT SUNBELT RENTALS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) DIRECTED TO DEFT CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) DIRECTED TO DEFT SUNBELT RENTALS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER ACEVEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SUNBELT RENTALS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/8/2021; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNBELT RENTALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Newsome, C Richard, ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stern, Michael Jesse