This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/26/2023 at 02:13:03 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JEF CONNELLY

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEF CONNELLY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, AUDREY MCKIBBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, AUDREY MCKIBBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

JEF CONNELLY

Jacksonville, FL 32210-1644

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hines, Michelle Kim

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4325732

2/2/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4325732

COVER SHEET

2/2/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

2/2/2023- D3- STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JEF CONNELLY -PLAINTIFF

2/2/2023- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JEF CONNELLY -PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED JEF CONNELLY

2/3/2023- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED JEF CONNELLY

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/13/2023 @11:40AM JEF CONNELLY (PERSONAL)

2/15/2023- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/13/2023 @11:40AM JEF CONNELLY (PERSONAL)

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

3/16/2023- D9- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • HearingTime: 1:30 PM; Type: NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location: Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom: 2379

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2023; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST JEF CONNELLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2023; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT DEFT FAILED TO APPEAR; DEFT SERVED; CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/16/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/13/2023 @11:40AM JEF CONNELLY (PERSONAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CO/CLAIMS>$500/=<$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed: $175.00; Paid: $175.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED JEF CONNELLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2023; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/16/2023 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4325732

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2023; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JEF CONNELLY -PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2023; STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2023; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less