Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 09:31:14 (UTC).

LEWIS WALKER VS AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 LEWIS WALKER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against AMY HIGGINBOTHAM. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEWIS WALKER

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Defendant

AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

Jacksonville, FL 32244

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3881174

5/5/2021- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3881174

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

5/5/2021- D13- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

4/21/2021- D11- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

4/21/2021- D10- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

4/21/2021- D9- DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

4/21/2021- D8- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 04/10/2021 @ 10:53AM TO TIM HIGGINBOTHAM TO AMY HIGGINBOTHAM (SUBSTITUTE)

4/21/2021- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 04/10/2021 @ 10:53AM TO TIM HIGGINBOTHAM TO AMY HIGGINBOTHAM (SUBSTITUTE)

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

4/9/2021- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFEDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

4/9/2021- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFEDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

4/9/2021- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF LEWIS WALKER = DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

4/9/2021- D2- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF LEWIS WALKER = DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3854965

4/9/2021- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3854965

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3881174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2021; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2021; FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19702 PAGE 779-779

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/21/2021; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/21/2021; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/21/2021; DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/21/2021; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) -AS TO DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/21/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 04/10/2021 @ 10:53AM TO TIM HIGGINBOTHAM TO AMY HIGGINBOTHAM (SUBSTITUTE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3854965

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFEDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF LEWIS WALKER = DEFENDANT AMY HIGGINBOTHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2021; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less