This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/05/2023 at 10:08:32 (UTC).

LESLIE ANN NOSTRANT, RICKY LEE NOSTRANT SR Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 LESLIE ANN NOSTRANT, RICKY LEE NOSTRANT SR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHEMER, JACK M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHEMER, JACK M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LESLIE ANN NOSTRANT

Yulee, FL 32097

Decedent

RICKY LEE NOSTRANT SR

Jacksonville, FL 32208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nicoletti, Alfred V

7512 Dr Phillips Blvd Ste 50-647

Orlando, FL 32819-5420

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

1/11/2023- D2- PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

1/11/2023- D3- PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE BOOK 20552 PAGE 31-31

1/11/2023- D4- AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE BOOK 20552 PAGE 31-31

CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

1/11/2023- D6- CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

CASE FEES PAID: $236.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4311108

1/11/2023- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $236.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4311108

ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20560 PAGE 2121-2122 RECORDED DOCUMENT

1/24/2023- D15- ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20560 PAGE 2121-2122 RECORDED DOCUMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2023; STATEMENT OF CLAIM -HCA FLORIDA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20560 PAGE 2121-2122 RECORDED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD BOOK 20560 PAGE 2119-2120 RECORDED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: NICOLETTI, ALFRED V

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; PETITIONER: NOSTRANT, LESLIE ANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 20560 PAGE 2121-2122

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/24/2023; ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD BOOK 20560 PAGE 2119-2120

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/18/2023; COVER SHEET W/ATTACHED PROPOSED ORDER DET H.S. & ORDER OF SUMM ADM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: PB/SUM ADMIN-ESTATE <$1000 09/04/2018; Assessed: $236.00; Paid: $236.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $236.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4311108

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE BOOK 20552 PAGE 31-31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM - INTESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; SUMMARY ADMIN-ESTATES VALUED AT LESS THAN $1,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less