This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/03/2023 at 01:01:32 (UTC).

LEONILA FUENTES JIMENEZ VS WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 LEONILA FUENTES JIMENEZ filed an Other lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEONILA FUENTES JIMENEZ

Defendant

WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Taylor, Kevin Brandon Jr

Reep, Randal Scott

Defendant Attorney

Ziegler, Allison Beth

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

1/30/2023- D2- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/30/2023- D3- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

1/30/2023- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4322745

1/30/2023- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4322745

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RANDAL REEP FOR LEONILA JIMENEZ AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

3/2/2023- D6- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RANDAL REEP FOR LEONILA JIMENEZ AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALLISON ZIEGLER FOR WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

3/20/2023- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALLISON ZIEGLER FOR WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - DEFT

3/20/2023- D8- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - DEFT

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFT'S)

3/20/2023- D9- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFT'S)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFT

3/20/2023- D10- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DEFT

3/20/2023- D11- REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DEFT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/01/2023 11:31A,=M SUBSTITUTE, DONNA MOCH FOR WAL-MART STORES EAST , LP

3/22/2023- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/01/2023 11:31A,=M SUBSTITUTE, DONNA MOCH FOR WAL-MART STORES EAST , LP

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

4/13/2023- D13- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

4/13/2023- D14- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2023; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2023; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2023; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/01/2023 11:31A,=M SUBSTITUTE, DONNA MOCH FOR WAL-MART STORES EAST , LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2023; REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2023; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2023; ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFT'S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2023; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/20/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ALLISON ZIEGLER FOR WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2023; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RANDAL REEP FOR LEONILA JIMENEZ AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4322745

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; SUMMONS ISSUED TO WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; OTHER NEGLIGENCE-PREMISES LIABILITY-COMMERCIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less