This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/12/2022 at 12:50:57 (UTC).

LAURA D DIMAS VS JOHN FREDERICK OSGOOD Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 LAURA D DIMAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN FREDERICK OSGOOD. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAURA D DIMAS

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

SCARLETT MAXINE BRYAN

Jacksonville, FL 32225

SUSAN WHITE DOWLING

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034

MARY PHELPS LATIMER

Jacksonville, FL 32218

JOHN FREDERICK OSGOOD

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen, James D III

50 N Laura St Ste 2500

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3646

Defendant Attorney

Azotea, David John

901 North Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/26/2022 @130PM VIA ZOOM

4/22/2022- D55- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/26/2022 @130PM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFT CROSS) VIDEOTAPED/ OF LAURA DIMAS DUCES TECUM ON 04/04/22 @ 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM

4/1/2022- D54- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFT CROSS) VIDEOTAPED/ OF LAURA DIMAS DUCES TECUM ON 04/04/22 @ 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM

MOTION TO STRIKE (DEFT JOHN FREDERICK OSGOOD'S) PLTF'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

3/24/2022- D53- MOTION TO STRIKE (DEFT JOHN FREDERICK OSGOOD'S) PLTF'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLTF LAURA DIMAS ON 04/04/22 @ 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM

3/17/2022- D52- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLTF LAURA DIMAS ON 04/04/22 @ 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

3/15/2022- D51- CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT., USAA

3/3/2022- D50- NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT., USAA

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT AND OFFER OF JUDGEMENT UPON DEFT, JOHN FREDRICK OSGOOD

2/22/2022- D49- NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT AND OFFER OF JUDGEMENT UPON DEFT, JOHN FREDRICK OSGOOD

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

2/2/2022- D48- CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT

1/19/2022- D47- NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT

CASE FEES PAID: $451.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3971674

8/26/2021- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $451.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3971674

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/26/2021- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/26/2021- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/26/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/26/2021- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/26/2021- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER ACCURATE SERVE

8/26/2021- D4- MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER ACCURATE SERVE

COMPLAINT

8/26/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

8/26/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/25/2022; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/26/2022 @130PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/4/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFT CROSS) VIDEOTAPED/ OF LAURA DIMAS DUCES TECUM ON 04/04/22 @ 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2022; MOTION TO STRIKE (DEFT JOHN FREDERICK OSGOOD'S) PLTF'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2022; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLTF LAURA DIMAS ON 04/04/22 @ 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2022; NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT., USAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/23/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT AND OFFER OF JUDGEMENT UPON DEFT, JOHN FREDRICK OSGOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2022; CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/19/2022; NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/19/2022; REQUEST FOR COPIES -DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $451.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3971674

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER ACCURATE SERVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/26/2021; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Azotea, David John