This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/13/2021 at 19:24:24 (UTC).

LATONYA GRAHAM VS HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 LATONYA GRAHAM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LATONYA GRAHAM

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Defendant

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

4200 Six Forks Road Suite 1400

Raleigh, NC 27609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shuster, Richard Scot

1413 South Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

8/17/2021- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3964259

8/17/2021- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3964259

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

8/16/2021- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

8/16/2021- D3- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

8/16/2021- D2- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS<$100 3/1/2012; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 11/18/2021 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3964259

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY-PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEntered: 8/17/2021; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHUSTER RICHARD