Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 06/11/2021 at 00:00:31 (UTC).

KIMMY LITTLEJOHN-CLARK VS BRUCE ANDREW CLARK

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 KIMMY LITTLEJOHN-CLARK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRUCE ANDREW CLARK. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLE, KAREN K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLE, KAREN K

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIMMY LITTLEJOHN-CLARK

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Respondent

BRUCE ANDREW CLARK

Muskegon, MI 49444

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Scone, Joseph Garth

Attorney at Samaritan Law Group

644 Cesery Blvd Ste 250

Jacksonville, FL 32211-3108

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861344

4/16/2021- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861344

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

4/15/2021- D5- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/12/2021; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: SCONE, JOSEPH GARTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEntered: 6/12/2021; CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2021; NOTICE OF HEARING -06/11/2021 @ 2:30 A.M. VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/7/2021; WAIVER OF NOTICE AND APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR COPIES/BRUCE ANDREW CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2021; WAIVER (JOINT) OF MANDATORY FINANCIAL DISCLOSURES/BRUCE ANDREW CARLK AND KIMMY LITTLE JOHN-CLARK/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3861344

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2021; SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less