This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/01/2022 at 17:04:54 (UTC).

KENNETH SHANKS JR VS PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 KENNETH SHANKS JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNETH SHANKS JR

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

6300 Wilson Mills Rd

Mayfield Village, OH 44143

Not Classified By Court

MEDIATOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gadd, Jeffrey Louis

Attorney at Farah and Farah, P.A.

1534 Kingsley Ave

Orange Park, FL 32073-4511

Defendant Attorneys

Boda, Ryan Thomas

Box #011 B, 625 Alpha Dr

Highland Heights, OH 44143-2114

Hulsey, Brittany Rose

5150 Belfort Rd Bldg 500

Jacksonville, FL 32256-6026

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Burnett, George Michael

P.O. Box 600980, 112 Bartram Oaks Walk #104-600980

St Johns, FL 32260-7701

 

Court Documents

WITNESS LIST FOR PLTF

6/21/2022- D32- WITNESS LIST FOR PLTF

NOTICE (DEFT) OF PRELIMINARY FACT WITNESSES

6/20/2022- D33- NOTICE (DEFT) OF PRELIMINARY FACT WITNESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RYAN BODA FOR PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

6/1/2022- D31- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RYAN BODA FOR PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 11/2/22 AT 9:30AM VIA ZOOM

5/31/2022- D30- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 11/2/22 AT 9:30AM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

5/31/2022- D29- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

5/31/2022- D28- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

5/31/2022- D27- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF VERIFIED/ PROPOUNDED BY PLTF

5/18/2022- D26- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF VERIFIED/ PROPOUNDED BY PLTF

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

5/9/2022- D24- ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL (CASE MANAGEMENT) AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQURING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE P/T 04/03/2023 @420PM RM739

5/9/2022- D23- ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL (CASE MANAGEMENT) AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQURING MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE P/T 04/03/2023 @420PM RM739

MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL -PLTF

5/5/2022- D22- MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL -PLTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

4/27/2022- D20- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF KENNETH J SHANKS JR ON 8/24/22 AT 9:30AM VIA ZOOM

4/26/2022- D21- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF KENNETH J SHANKS JR ON 8/24/22 AT 9:30AM VIA ZOOM

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT) TO PLAINTIFF'S

4/22/2022- D19- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT) TO PLAINTIFF'S

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY PLANTIFF

4/22/2022- D18- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY PLANTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BRITTANY HULSEY FOR PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

4/8/2022- D17- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BRITTANY HULSEY FOR PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) PLTF'S/

4/8/2022- D16- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S) PLTF'S/

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF KENNETH J SHANKS JR

4/8/2022- D15- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF KENNETH J SHANKS JR

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:30 AM; Type : JURY TRIAL; Location : NO COURT ROOM ENTERED; Courtroom : 0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; WITNESS LIST FOR PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; NOTICE (DEFT) OF PRELIMINARY FACT WITNESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RYAN BODA FOR PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 11/2/22 AT 9:30AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/31/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/31/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/31/2022; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF VERIFIED/ PROPOUNDED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/10/2022; JURY TRIAL 04/17/2023 9:30 AM - 0 NO COURT ROOM ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4108450

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF FIRST) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/15/2022; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Express Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burnett, George Michael